US HB1830 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 219-89)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-247. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 219-89)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-247. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue $5 gold coins, $1 silver coins, and half-dollar clad coins emblematic of the National Purple Heart Hall of Honor. The bill limits the issuance of such coins to the one-year period beginning on January 1, 2022. The bill prescribes surcharges for coin sales, which shall be paid to the National Purple Heart Honor Mission, Inc., to support the mission of such organization, including capital improvements to the National Purple Heart Hall of Honor facilities.
Title
National Purple Heart Hall of Honor Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-247. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-22 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-02 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6035) |
2020-12-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1830. |
2020-12-02 | House | Mr. Clay moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H6035-6036) |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6694) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2687 Amendment SA 2687 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2687 Amendment SA 2687 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S6693-6694; text: CR S6694) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6693-6694) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7816) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1830. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7816-7818) |
2019-09-19 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2042 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text: CR S4635)
SB2815 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HCR125 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB2815 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HCR125 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
New York State
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
New York State
Veterans' organizations and recognition