US HB1829 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Government Accountability Office to study the role pharmaceutical benefit managers play in the pharmaceutical supply chain and provide Congress with appropriate policy recommendations, and for other purposes.
Title
Pharmacy Benefit Manager Accountability Study Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] |
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Victoria Spartz [R-IN] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB298 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4293 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 647.
SB4293 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 647.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1829/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1829/BILLS-117hr1829ih.pdf |