US HB1812 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-176. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Vet Center Eligibility Expansion Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vet Center Eligibility Expansion Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-20HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-176. (TXT | PDF)
2020-10-20HouseSigned by President.
2020-10-09HousePresented to President.
2020-09-29SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-09-24SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5881)
2020-09-17HouseAUTHORIZING DUPLICATE ENGROSSMENT - Mr. Cunningham asked for unanimous consent that the Clerk be authorized to produce a duplicate engrossment of H.R. 1812. Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-05-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4034)
2019-05-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1812.
2019-05-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4034-4035)
2019-05-21HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-20HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 51.
2019-05-20HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-75.
2019-05-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-03-18HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback