US HB1801 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to increase the maximum age for children eligible for medical care under the CHAMPVA program, and for other purposes.
Title
CHAMPVA Children’s Care Protection Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB272 (Same As) 2021-09-24 - Became Public Law No: 117-40.
SB727 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
SB727 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1801/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1801/BILLS-117hr1801ih.pdf |