US HB1794 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the requirements for calculating taxable income to exclude from gross income any AmeriCorps educational awards provided under the National and Community Service Act of 1990.
Title
Segal AmeriCorps Education Award Tax Relief Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1355 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5829 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6415 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
SB3964 (Related) 2020-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5829 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6415 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
SB3964 (Related) 2020-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Higher education
Income tax exclusion
National and community service
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Income tax exclusion
National and community service
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1794/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1794/BILLS-116hr1794ih.pdf |