US HB1783 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To make high-speed broadband internet service accessible and affordable to all Americans, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accessible, Affordable Internet for All Act

Sponsors

Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB724 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB741 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB745 (Related) 2021-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB979 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1590 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB1631 (Related) 2021-05-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E501-502)
HB1672 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB1673 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB1700 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB1841 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB1721 (Related) 2021-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
HB1848 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB1714 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB1460 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3703 (Related) 2021-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adult education and literacy
Aging
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Department of Commerce
Digital media
Disability and paralysis
Economic development
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Food assistance and relief
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Internet and video services
Labor standards
Labor-management relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Libraries and archives
Medicaid
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Preschool education
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Right of privacy
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback