US HB1781 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Fentanyl Control Act This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to modify the drug quantity thresholds that trigger a mandatory minimum prison term for a defendant who manufactures, distributes, or possesses with intent to distribute fentanyl. It also establishes a consecutive mandatory prison term for a defendant who commits a drug offense involving a detectable amount of heroin or fentanyl. The bill establishes a rebuttable presumption that the illegal manufacture of a controlled substance that contains a detectable amount of heroin or fentanyl creates a substantial risk of harm to human life. The Drug Enforcement Administration may temporarily place a drug or substance into schedule I based on a finding: (1) that the drug or substance satisfies the criteria for being a synthetic opioid, and (2) that adding it will prevent abuse or misuse. The bill makes it a crime to knowingly mail to an unauthorized person equipment that may be used to manufacture counterfeit controlled substances. A violator is subject to criminal penalties. Finally, it makes it a crime to import, export, manufacture, distribute, dispense, or possess with intent to manufacture, distribute, or dispense, a synthetic opioid that is not clearly labeled. A violator is subject to criminal and civil penalties.
Title
Comprehensive Fentanyl Control Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1354 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3283 (Related) 2017-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB2481 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Terrorism. Hearings held.
HB3283 (Related) 2017-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB2481 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Terrorism. Hearings held.
Subjects
Asia
China
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health programs administration and funding
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mexico
Postal service
Retail and wholesale trades
China
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health programs administration and funding
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mexico
Postal service
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1781/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1781/BILLS-115hr1781ih.pdf |