US HB1777 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - On motion to refer the bill and the accompanying veto message to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H7178)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - On motion to refer the bill and the accompanying veto message to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H7178)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Presidential Allowance Modernization Act (Sec. 2) This bill revises provisions relating to presidential pensions to allow former Presidents a lifetime annual annuity of $200,000 and an additional annual monetary allowance of $200,000, each adjusted annually for cost-of-living increases as provided by the Social Security Act. It reduces the annual monetary allowance by the amount that a former President's adjusted gross income in a taxable year exceeds $400,000. The bill prohibits the monetary allowance from being less than the amount that the General Services Administration and the U.S. Secret Service determine is needed to pay the increased cost of doing business that is attributable to the security needs of the former President. The annuity and allowance shall not be payable for any period during which a former President holds an appointive or elective position in or under the federal government that pays more than a nominal rate. The bill increases from $20,000 to $100,000 the annual annuity of a surviving spouse of a former President. (Sec. 3) Nothing in this bill shall be construed to affect: (1) a law relating to the security or protection of a former President or a family member of a former President, or (2) funding to carry out such security or protection. (Sec. 4) The bill applies to an individual who is a former President or the widow of a former President as of the date of enactment. (Sec. 5) For a former President receiving a monetary allowance before the enactment of this bill, the reduction of the monetary allowance for adjusted gross income required by this bill applies, except to the extent that it would prevent the former President from being able to pay the cost of a lease or other contract that is in effect on the day before enactment of this bill and under which the former President makes payments using the monetary allowance.
Title
Presidential Allowance Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Senate | On motion to refer the bill and the accompanying veto message to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H7178) |
2016-12-05 | Senate | ORDER OF BUSINESS - Mr. Chaffetz asked unanimous consent, notwithstanding the order of the House of September 22, 2016, that the veto message of the President on the bill, H.R. 1777, together with the accompanying bill, be referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Mr. Chaffetz asked unanimous consent, notwithstanding the order of the House of September 22, 2016, that the veto message of the President on the bill, H.R. 1777, together with the accompanying bill, be referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Notwithstanding the order of the House of July 25, 2016, Mr. Hurd asked unanimous consent that further consideration of the veto message and the bill, H.R. 1777, be postponed until the legislative day of December 9, 2016. |
2016-07-25 | Senate | The Chair announced that the objections of the President to H.R. 1777 would be spread at large upon the Journal and the veto message would be printed as a House document (114-155). |
2016-07-25 | Senate | The Chair laid before the House the veto message from the President. (consideration: CR H5034) |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Vetoed by President. |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-07-08 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agree to the Senate amendment: CR H4562-4563) |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Mr. Chaffetz asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H4562-4563) |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.4852 Amendment SA 4852 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.4852 Amendment SA 4852 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Ernst. (consideration: CR S4428-4429; text: CR S4428-4429) |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4428) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-01-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-01-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H241) |
2016-01-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1777. |
2016-01-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H241-242) |
2016-01-11 | House | Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-07-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157. |
2015-07-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-209. |
2015-05-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1411 (Related) 2016-06-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 507.
SB3011 (Related) 2016-06-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
SB3011 (Related) 2016-06-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
Subjects
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents