US HB1775 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription Reduction in Costs for Everyone (PRICE) Act of 2017 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require the President, with respect to offering one or more Medicare-operated prescription drug plan options, to: (1) negotiate prices with drug manufacturers, and (2) establish and apply a formulary and formulary incentives. In general, a Medicare-operated drug plan must meet the same requirements as apply to other prescription drug plans. The President must report to Congress biannually on negotiations conducted by the President to achieve lower prices for Medicare beneficiaries.
Title
Prescription Reduction in Costs for Everyone (PRICE) Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1688 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6575 (Related) 2018-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6575 (Related) 2018-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Health
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1775/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1775/BILLS-115hr1775ih.pdf |