US HB1773 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 229-65)
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-195. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 229-65)
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-195. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to make appropriate arrangements for the award of a single Congressional Gold Medal to Rosie the Riveter (i.e., any female individual who held employment or volunteered in support of the war efforts during World War II), in recognition of their contributions to the United States and the inspiration they have provided to ensuing generations. The medal shall be displayed at the National Museum of American History, which must make the medal available for display at other locations associated with Rosie the Riveter.
Title
Rosie the Riveter Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-195. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6664) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8809) |
2019-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1773. |
2019-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8809-8811) |
2019-11-13 | House | Ms. Garcia (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-12 | House | Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Ms. Speier. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB892 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
District of Columbia
Labor and employment
Manufacturing
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
U.S. history
Women's employment
Congressional tributes
District of Columbia
Labor and employment
Manufacturing
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
U.S. history
Women's employment