US HB1771 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Divided Families Reunification Act This bill directs the Department of State to periodically report to Congress on its consultations with South Korea on potential opportunities to reunite Korean Americans with family in North Korea. The State Department's Special Envoy on North Korean Human Rights Issues shall periodically report to Congress on its consultations with representatives of Korean Americans with family in North Korea on reunification efforts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Divided Families Reunification Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 92 (Y: 391 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2020-03-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 92). (text: CR H1547)
2020-03-09HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1549)
2020-03-09HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-03-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1771.
2020-03-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1547-1548)
2020-03-09HouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-10-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-03-14HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E307)
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3395 (Related) 2020-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback