US HB1771 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to periodically report to Congress on its consultations with South Korea on potential opportunities to reunite Korean Americans with family in North Korea. The State Department's Special Envoy on North Korean Human Rights Issues shall periodically report to Congress on its consultations with representatives of Korean Americans with family in North Korea on reunification efforts.
Title
Divided Families Reunification Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 92 (Y: 391 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 92). (text: CR H1547) |
2020-03-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1549) |
2020-03-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-03-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1771. |
2020-03-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1547-1548) |
2020-03-09 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-03-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E307) |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3395 (Related) 2020-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Family relationships
International affairs
Internet and video services
North Korea
South Korea
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Family relationships
International affairs
Internet and video services
North Korea
South Korea