US HB1762 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-179. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-179. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in The Dalles, Oregon, as the "Loren R. Kaufman Memorial Veterans' Clinic". The Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic located at 704 Veterans Drive, The Dalles, Oregon, shall be designated as the "Loren R. Kaufman VA Clinic."
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in The Dalles, Oregon, as the "Loren R. Kaufman Memorial Veterans' Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-179. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3812) |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-05-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2910) |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1762. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2910-2911) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-04-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2828 (Related) 2016-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Oregon
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Oregon
Veterans' medical care