US HB1759 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

BRIDGE for Workers Act Building on Reemployment Improvements to Deliver Good Employment for Workers Act This bill extends eligibility for reemployment services to all individuals claiming unemployment compensation. Currently, only unemployment claimants that are identified as likely to exhaust their regular unemployment compensation are eligible for such reemployment services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BRIDGE for Workers Act Building on Reemployment Improvements to Deliver Good Employment for Workers Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 162 (Y: 393 N: 24 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-04-09HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 24 (Roll no. 162). (text: CR H3148)
2019-04-09HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3168)
2019-04-09HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-04-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1759.
2019-04-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3148-3151)
2019-04-09HouseMr. Davis, Danny K. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-04-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 18.
2019-04-09HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-38.
2019-04-02HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-04-02HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback