US HB1755 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates a declaration of national emergency made by the President after 30 days unless Congress votes to extend the declaration. (Currently, Congress can cancel an emergency declaration only by passing a resolution that can withstand a presidential veto.) The bill establishes procedures for congressional review of declarations of national emergencies. The President shall (1) transmit specified information to Congress with any proclamation declaring or renewing a national emergency, including a description of the circumstances necessitating the declaration or renewal of a national emergency declaration and its estimated duration; and (2) report periodically on the status of the emergency.
Title
ARTICLE ONE Act Assuring that Robust, Thorough, and Informed Congressional Leadership is Exercised Over National Emergencies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB764 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307.
SB1809 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1809 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1755/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1755/BILLS-116hr1755ih.pdf |