US HB1755 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-135. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-135. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 36, United States Code, to make certain improvements in the congressional charter of the Disabled American Veterans. (Sec. 1) This bill states that Disabled American Veterans (the corporation) is organized exclusively for charitable and educational purposes, and includes among its purposes: (1) education of the public about the sacrifices and needs of disabled veterans, and (2) education of disabled veterans about the benefits and resources available to them. On dissolution or final liquidation of the corporation, any assets remaining after the discharge or satisfactory provision for the discharge of all liabilities shall be transferred to the Department of Veterans Affairs for the care of disabled veterans.
Title
To amend title 36, United States Code, to make certain improvements in the congressional charter of the Disabled American Veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-135. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1349) |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8426) |
2015-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1755. |
2015-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8426-8427) |
2015-11-30 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-11-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 269. |
2015-11-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-350. |
2015-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-09-16 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged. |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-04-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Federally chartered organizations
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Disability and paralysis
Federally chartered organizations
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition