US HB1735 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community Empowerment for Mitigated Properties Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to issue guidance regarding the acquisition of property for open space as a hazard mitigation measure under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act, which shall include: a process by which the state hazard mitigation officer appointed for such acquisition shall, within 60 days after an applicant for assistance enters into the acquisition agreement, provide written notification to each affected local government that includes the location and a description of the acquisition, the state-local assistance agreement for the hazard mitigation grant program, and a copy of the deed restriction; and recommendations for entering into and implementing a memorandum of understanding between local governments and covered entities that allows an affected local government to use and maintain the open space created by such a project, consistent with such Act and all adjoining property and subject to the notification of the adjoining property, so long as the maintenance cost is borne by the local government, and to maintain the open space pursuant to standards exceeding any local government standards defined in the agreement with FEMA. A "covered entity" includes the grantee or subgrantee receiving assistance for an open space project, the state in which such project is located, and the applicable regional administrator of FEMA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Empowerment for Mitigated Properties Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-21HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
2017-11-21HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-417.
2017-07-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-07-27HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
2017-07-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
2017-03-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2017-03-27HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E390)
2017-03-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB3041 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback