US HB1734 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to allow the Secretary of the Interior to delegate certain emergency reclamation activities to the States and Tribes, and for other purposes.
Title
Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act Amendments of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] |
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 407. |
2022-11-16 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-566, Part I. |
2021-05-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-26 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2021-03-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.