US HB1719 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act (Sec. 3) The Department of the Interior may acquire by donation approximately 44 acres of land to include in the John Muir National Historic Site in Martinez, California. The acquired land shall be administered as part of such site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 401 N: 15 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenatePresented to President.
2018-06-07SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-06-06SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3263-3264)
2017-07-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 172.
2017-07-12HouseMr. McClintock asked unanimous consent that the Clerk be authorized to make technical corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1719, to include addition of an enacting clause. Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-11HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 15 (Roll no. 346). (text: CR H5408)
2017-07-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5418-5419)
2017-07-11HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-07-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1719.
2017-07-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5408-5409)
2017-07-11HouseMr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-07-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 145.
2017-07-11HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-208.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-04-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB729 (Related) 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 60.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback