US HB1717 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to make permanent the protections under Medicaid for recipients of home and community-based services against spousal impoverishment.
Title
Protecting Married Seniors from Impoverishment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1099 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4131 (Related) 2021-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HB4131 (Related) 2021-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1717/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1717/BILLS-117hr1717ih.pdf |