US HB1704 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ACCESS Act of 2017 Accessible Care by Curbing Excessive lawSuitS Act of 2017 This bill establishes provisions governing health care lawsuits where coverage for the care was provided or subsidized by the federal government. The bill does not preempt certain state laws and federal vaccine injury laws and rules. The statute of limitations is three years after the injury or one year after the claimant discovers the injury, whichever occurs first, with exceptions. Noneconomic damages are limited to $250,000. Juries may not be informed of this limitation. Courts must supervise the payment of damages and may restrict attorney contingency fees. The bill sets limits on contingency fees. Certain evidence regarding collateral source benefits (e.g., insurance payments) may be introduced in lawsuits involving injury or wrongful death. The bill provides for periodic payment of future damage awards. A health care provider who prescribes, or dispenses pursuant to a prescription, a medical product approved by the Food and Drug Administration may not be a party to a liability lawsuit or class action lawsuit regarding the product. Expressions of apology, fault, or sympathy by health care providers or their employees to patients or their relatives or representatives regarding suffering, injury, or death from an unanticipated outcome of care are inadmissible as evidence of liability. A person must give a health care provider 90 days' notice before commencing a lawsuit, with exceptions. An affidavit of merit signed by a health care professional who qualifies as an expert witness must be filed simultaneously with a lawsuit. The bill establishes qualifications for expert witnesses.
Title
ACCESS Act of 2017 Accessible Care by Curbing Excessive lawSuitS Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1215 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR382 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR382 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Evidence and witnesses
Health
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Legal fees and court costs
Medical education
Prescription drugs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Evidence and witnesses
Health
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Legal fees and court costs
Medical education
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1704/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1704/BILLS-115hr1704ih.pdf |