US HB1702 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Waives the application fee for any special use permit solely for a veterans special event at war memorials on land administered by the National Park Service in the District of Columbia and its environs.
Title
Free Veterans from Fees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-09-21 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4567) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1702. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4567-4568) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 392. |
2020-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-490. |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-12-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Licensing and registrations
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Licensing and registrations
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Veterans' organizations and recognition