US HB1698 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bullion and Collectible Coin Production Efficiency and Cost Savings Act (Sec. 2) This bill repeals: (1) the authority of the Secretary of the Treasury to change the design of certain gold bullion coins, and (2) requirements for the protective covering for certain bullion coins. The copper content requirements for quarter dollar coins are repealed and the silver content is required to be not less than 90%. Technical revisions are made to the requirements for palladium bullion investment coins. (Sec. 3) Proof and uncirculated versions of American Eagle silver coins issued during calendar year 2016 shall have a smooth edge incused with a designation that notes the 30th anniversary of the first issue of such coins.
Title
Bullion and Collectible Coin Production Efficiency and Cost Savings Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2015-06-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4563) |
2015-06-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1698. |
2015-06-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4562-4563) |
2015-06-23 | House | Mr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)