US HB1694 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Money Remittances Improvement Act of 2013 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury, with respect to compliance with reporting requirements for monetary instrument transactions of certain financial institutions, to rely upon examinations conducted by the relevant state supervisory agency if: (1) the category of financial institution is required by state law to comply with federal requirements, or (2) the state supervisory agency is authorized to ensure that the financial institution complies with such federal requirements. Empowers the Director of the Financial Crimes Enforcement Network (FinCen) to furnish research, analytical, and informational services to foreign regulatory agencies in the interest of detection, prevention, and prosecution of terrorism, organized crime, money laundering, and other financial crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Money Remittances Improvement Act of 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.

Same As/Similar To

SB1840 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4386 (Related) 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-156.
SB2208 (Related) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback