US HB1694 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 (the Act), with respect to the Battlefield Acquisition Grant Program, to: (1) expand the current definition of "battlefield report" to include the report entitled "Report to Congress on the Historic Preservation of Revolutionary War and War of 1812 Sites in the United States"; and (2) expand the Program to permit the acquisition not only of an "interest in an eligible site," but also an "eligible site." Requires acquisitions of lands or interests under the Act to be from willing sellers only. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to submit to Congress a report on related activities, including: (1) preservation carried out at the battlefields and associated sites identified in the battlefield report; (2) changes in their condition; and (3) other relevant developments related to such battlefields and sites. Authorizes appropriations to the Secretary to provide grants under the Program through FY2019 for the protection of Civil War, Revolutionary War, and War of 1812 battlefields.
Title
Revolutionary War and War of 1812 Battlefield Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] |
Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with amendments. With written report No. 111-152. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. | |
2009-07-15 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. | |
2009-04-22 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-04-21 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-04-21 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-04-21 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4528) | |
2009-04-21 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1694. | |
2009-04-21 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4528-4530) | |
2009-04-21 | Mrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Same As) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB1168 (Related) 2009-07-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-92.
SB1168 (Related) 2009-07-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-92.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Europe
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
United Kingdom
Europe
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
United Kingdom