US HB1689 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses offshore wind development in certain submerged lands off the U.S. territories and coral reef conservation. Specifically, the bill requires the Department of the Interior to study the feasibility of conducting wind lease sales on the Outer Continental Shelf in the U.S. Exclusive Economic Zone adjacent to U.S. territories. If the study determines that such leases are feasible, then Interior must conduct wind lease sales in those areas as specified by this bill. In addition, the bill establishes the Coral Reef Conservation Fund for the Department of Commerce to carry out the Coral Reef Conservation Act of 2000, including to preserve, sustain, and restore the condition of coral reef ecosystems. The bill also specifies requirements for distributing revenues from the leases authorized by this bill to the Treasury, the Coral Reef Conservation Fund, and U.S. territories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offshore Wind for Territories Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
2021-04-20HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3312 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4334 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback