US HB1686 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-10)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing Diabetes in Medicare Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend Medicare coverage to medical nutrition therapy services for people with pre-diabetes and risk factors for developing type-2 diabetes.
Title
Preventing Diabetes in Medicare Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3082 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1686/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1686/BILLS-114hr1686ih.pdf |