US HB1680 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises criminal provisions related to the interstate transportation of firearms and ammunition. An individual may transport a firearm between two places (e.g., states) where it is legal to possess, carry, or transport the firearm. During transport, the firearm must be unloaded and secured or securely stored. Additionally, an individual may transport ammunition, or a detachable magazine or feeding device, between two places where it is legal to possess, carry, or transport the ammunition, magazine, or feeding device. During transport, the ammunition, magazine, or feeding device must not be loaded into a firearm and must be securely stored. The term transport includes staying in temporary lodging; stopping for food, fuel, vehicle maintenance, an emergency, or medical treatment; or any other activity incidental to the transport. The bill prohibits the arrest or detention of an individual for a state or local firearm or ammunition violation unless there is probable cause to believe the individual failed to comply with the provisions of this bill, and there is probable cause to believe the individual committed another crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawful Interstate Transportation of Firearms Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB225 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB525 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback