US HB1673 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water Affordability, Transparency, Equity, and Reliability Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) establish a Water Affordability, Transparency, Equity, and Reliability Trust Fund; (2) modify the definition of subpart F income (i.e., income of a controlled foreign corporation earned outside the United States that is not tax-deferred) to include income of a controlled foreign corporation derived from a foreign country; and (3) transfer to the fund revenues from the newly included subpart F income. The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) and the Department of Agriculture must allocate funds from the trust fund to specified clean water programs, drinking water programs, and water well systems. The bill amends Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to authorize the EPA to make grants for providing technical assistance concerning water and sanitation infrastructure and drinking water systems to rural and small municipalities and tribal governments. The EPA must establish a grant program for repairing, replacing, or upgrading septic tanks and drainage fields. The bill amends the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to make permanent a grant program for household water well systems in rural areas. The bill revises requirements concerning the clean water state revolving fund (SRF) and the drinking water SRF. The bill amends the Safe Drinking Water Act to require the EPA to make grants to local educational agencies for: (1) infrastructure to ensure that drinking water in schools is lead free, and (2) testing drinking water in schools for lead.
Title
Water Affordability, Transparency, Equity, and Reliability Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5609 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Foreign and international corporations
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian social and development programs
Labor-management relations
Metals
Public utilities and utility rates
Racial and ethnic relations
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Taxation of foreign income
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Foreign and international corporations
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian social and development programs
Labor-management relations
Metals
Public utilities and utility rates
Racial and ethnic relations
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Taxation of foreign income
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1673/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1673/BILLS-115hr1673ih.pdf |