US HB1672 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
REDEEM Act Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment Act of 2015 Amends the federal criminal code to provide a process for the sealing or expungement of records relating to nonviolent criminal or juvenile offenses. Requires a court considering a petition to seal a nonviolent offense to balance factors including the harm of the protected information to the ability of the petitioner to secure and maintain employment. Sets forth limitations on involuntary room confinements at juvenile detention facilities. Amends the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996 (PRWORA) to remove offenses relating to possession or use of a controlled substance from the categories of drug offenses that result in the convicted individual being ineligible for assistance under: (1) a state program funded with temporary assistance for needy families (TANF) grants under part A of title IV of the Social Security Act; or (2) the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP, formerly the food stamp program) or any state program carried out under the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008. Prohibits the denial of such assistance and benefits if the convicted individual: (1) has completed, is participating in, or agrees to enroll in a substance abuse treatment program; (2) is a custodial parent; (3) is suffering from a serious illness; (4) is pregnant; or (5) is in compliance with the terms of a sentence imposed for the conviction. Includes employment services among the categories of federal benefits that are not to be denied under PRWORA. Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to allow the Department of Justice (DOJ), in awarding public safety and community policing grants, to give preferential consideration to an applicant in a state with laws similar to this Act. Directs DOJ to establish procedures for the prompt release of accurate records exchanged for employment-related purposes through the Federal Bureau of Investigation's background check system. Requires DOJ to: (1) obtain the consent of an individual to whom a record pertains as a condition to exchanging records with an entity requesting the information for employment, housing, or credit application purposes; and (2) allow individuals to challenge the accuracy and completeness of their records. Prohibits exchanges of records regarding: (1) an arrest more than two years before a record request if the record does not also include the disposition of that arrest; (2) non-serious offenses, such as drunkenness, vagrancy, loitering, disturbing the peace, or curfew violations; or (3) circumstances that are not clearly arrests or dispositions.
Title
REDEEM Act Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB675 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1965 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6387-6388)
SB1965 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6387-6388)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employee hiring
Evidence and witnesses
Food assistance and relief
Government studies and investigations
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Personnel records
Poverty and welfare assistance
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employee hiring
Evidence and witnesses
Food assistance and relief
Government studies and investigations
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Personnel records
Poverty and welfare assistance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1672/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1672/BILLS-114hr1672ih.pdf |