US HB1665 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies National Science Foundation (NSF) grant programs that support STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics, including computer science) education. (Sec. 3) The bill instructs the NSF, when awarding grants under the Discovery Research PreK-12 program, to improve the focus of research and development on early childhood education. (Sec. 4) The bill specifies that NSF grants to increase the participation of underrepresented populations in STEM fields may be used for research into various subjects regarding female students in prekindergarten through elementary school, including the role of teachers and caregivers in encouraging or discouraging participation by such students in STEM activities, and the types of STEM activities that encourage greater participation by such students. (Sec. 5) The bill specifies that NSF grants to research computer science education and computational thinking may be used to support development and implementation of various tools and models for teaching and learning, including developing and offering gender-inclusive computer science enrichment programs, and acquainting female students in prekindergarten through elementary school with careers in computer science.
Title
Building Blocks of STEM Act
Sponsors
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7166-7167) |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1665. |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7166-7168) |
2019-07-23 | House | Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB737 (Same As) 2019-12-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-102. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Computers and information technology
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Preschool education
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's education
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Preschool education
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's education