US HB1664 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on December 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-80.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on December 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-80.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the National Medal of Honor Museum Foundation to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.
Title
To authorize the National Medal of Honor Museum Foundation to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 416 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-80. |
2021-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9309; text: CR S9309) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 202. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-52. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2021-07-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-07-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 220). (text: CR H3861) |
2021-07-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3886-3887) |
2021-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1664. |
2021-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3861-3862) |
2021-07-26 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 80. |
2021-07-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-107. |
2021-07-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-07-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-14 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-05-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB172 (Same As) 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 199.
SB172 (Same As) 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 199.