US HB1651 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act Reauthorization of 2015 Amends the Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act (FLTFA) to reauthorize, until July 25, 2020, the program for the completion of appraisals and satisfaction of other legal requirements for the sale or exchange of public land identified for disposal under approved land use plans under the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976. Directs the Department of the Interior to: (1) establish and maintain a database containing a comprehensive list of all of the public land identified for disposal under such plans, and (2) make such database available to the public on the website of Interior. Allows a state to use any funds made available from the Federal Land Disposal Account for same-state purchases that are not obligated or expended by the end of the fourth fiscal year after the sale or exchange of the land that generated such funds. Instructs Interior and the Department of Agriculture, in prioritizing the acquisition of inholdings and non-federal lands with exceptional resources, to consider the extent to which the acquisition of the land or interest therein will increase public availability of resources for, and facilitate public access to, hunting, fishing, and other recreational activities. Requires any remaining balance in the Federal Land Disposal Account to be deposited into the Treasury and used for deficit reduction, except that in the case of a fiscal year for which there is no federal budget deficit, such amounts shall be used to reduce the federal debt. Makes the FLTFA inapplicable to land eligible for sale under specified public land laws.
Title
Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act Reauthorization of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E437) |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2406 (Related) 2016-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB3173 (Related) 2015-08-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB2189 (Related) 2015-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB3173 (Related) 2015-08-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB2189 (Related) 2015-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Government information and archives
Hunting and fishing
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Government information and archives
Hunting and fishing
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1651/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1651/BILLS-114hr1651ih.pdf |