US HB1649 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business Development Center Cyber Training Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Development Center Cyber Training Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150.
2019-07-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5809)
2019-07-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1649.
2019-07-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5809-5810)
2019-07-15HouseMr. Delgado moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-06-13HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 81.
2019-06-13HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-112.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB771 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback