US HB1643 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Digital Goods and Services Tax Fairness Act of 2015 Prohibits a state or local jurisdiction from imposing multiple or discriminatory taxes on the sale or use of a digital good or service delivered or transferred electronically to a customer. Excludes from the definition of "digital service" a service that is predominantly attributable to the direct, contemporaneous expenditure of live human effort, skill, or expertise, a telecommunications service, an ancillary service, an Internet access service, an audio or video programming service, or a hotel intermediary service. Restricts taxation of a digital good or service to taxation by a state or local jurisdiction whose territorial limits encompass a customer tax address, as defined by this Act. Makes the seller of digital goods or services responsible for obtaining and maintaining such address. Provides for the taxation of digital goods and services transactions that are aggregated and not separately stated.
Title
Digital Goods and Services Tax Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-06-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-16 | House | Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Discharged. |
2015-06-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB851 (Related) 2015-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Digital media
Internet and video services
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Internet and video services
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1643/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1643/BILLS-114hr1643ih.pdf |