US HB163 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gun Manufacturers Accountability Act This bill amends the Protection of Lawful Commerce in Arms Act to repeal provisions that prohibit state or federal civil actions or administrative proceedings from being brought against firearm or ammunition manufacturers, sellers, importers, dealers, or trade associations for criminal or unlawful misuse of a firearm by the person bringing the action or a third party.
Title
Gun Manufacturers Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3984 (Related) 2017-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB1939 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1939 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Firearms and explosives
Law
Manufacturing
Product safety and quality
Retail and wholesale trades
Firearms and explosives
Law
Manufacturing
Product safety and quality
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr163/BILLS-115hr163ih.pdf |