US HB1619 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the status of gaming conducted by the Catawba Indian Nation, and for other purposes.
Title
Catawba Indian Nation Lands Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-01 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 361 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2021-11-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 55, 3 Present (Roll no. 340). (text: CR H6039) |
2021-11-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6053-6054) |
2021-11-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1619. |
2021-11-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6039-6041) |
2021-11-01 | House | Ms. Leger Fernandez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-08-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 82. |
2021-08-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-114. |
2021-05-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-21 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |