US HB1611 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Robert Levinson Hostage Recovery and Hostage-Taking Accountability Act This bill establishes various entities and procedures to address the wrongful detainment of U.S. nationals abroad.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Robert Levinson Hostage Recovery and Hostage-Taking Accountability Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB712 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback