US HB1603 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide for terms and conditions for nonimmigrant workers performing agricultural labor or services, and for other purposes.
Title
Strategy and Investment in Rural Housing Preservation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - On passage (Y: 247 N: 174 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 204 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 204 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-18 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 247 - 174 (Roll no. 93). (text: CR H1527-1549) |
2021-03-18 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 204 - 218 (Roll no. 92). |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1569-1570) |
2021-03-18 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, the House resumed consideration of H.R. 1603. |
2021-03-18 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further consideration of H.R. 1603 is postponed. |
2021-03-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Fischbach motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the motion to recommit, and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Fischbach demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-03-18 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-18 | House | Mrs. Fischbach moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H1560) |
2021-03-18 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1603. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868 and H.J. Res. 17. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868, and H.J.Res. 17. The resolution provides that H.Res. 232 is hereby adopted. |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 233. (consideration: CR H1527-1560) |
2021-03-16 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 233 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868 and H.J. Res. 17. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868, and H.J.Res. 17. The resolution provides that H.Res. 232 is hereby adopted. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR233 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1537 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1728 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB1882 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB4872 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Housing, Transportation, and Community Development. Hearings held.
HB1537 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1728 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB1882 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB4872 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Housing, Transportation, and Community Development. Hearings held.