US HB1603 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military SAVE Act Military Sexual Assault Victims Empowerment Act This bill amends the Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 to make eligible for treatment in a non-Department of Veterans Affairs entity any veteran who was the victim of a sexual trauma which occurred while the veteran was serving on active duty, active duty for training, or inactive duty training.
Title
Military SAVE Act Military Sexual Assault Victims Empowerment Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2521 (Related) 2016-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Health facilities and institutions
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Health facilities and institutions
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1603/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1603/BILLS-114hr1603ih.pdf |