US HB1600 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RAILWAY Act Repurposing Assets to Increase Long-term Water Availability and Yield Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RAILWAY Act Repurposing Assets to Increase Long-term Water Availability and Yield Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2019-04-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback