US HB1596 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Commission to Study the Stigmatization, Criminalization, and Ongoing Exclusion and Inequity for LGBTQ Servicemembers and Veterans.
Title
Commission to Study the Stigmatization, Criminalization, and Ongoing Exclusion and Inequity for LGBTQ Servicemembers and Veterans Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 10. |
2021-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-04 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2021-09-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2188 (Same As) 2021-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1596/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1596/BILLS-117hr1596ih.pdf |