US HB1593 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

CLASS Act of 2019 Coordinating and Leveraging Activities for School Security Act This bill establishes in the Department of Homeland Security a council to ensure the coordination of activities, plans, and policies to enhance the security of schools and preschools against acts of terrorism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CLASS Act of 2019 Coordinating and Leveraging Activities for School Security Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 137 (Y: 384 N: 18 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-01HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 18 (Roll no. 137). (text: CR H2929)
2019-04-01HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2933)
2019-04-01HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-04-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1593.
2019-04-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2929-2930)
2019-04-01HouseMr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 11.
2019-03-28HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-25.
2019-03-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback