US HB1573 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides various protections for covered individuals subject to secondary or deferred inspections when seeking admission into the United States. Covered individuals include U.S. nationals, lawful permanent residents, aliens in possession of a visa, returning asylees, and refugees. The Department of Homeland Security shall ensure that a covered individual subject to secondary or deferred inspection has a meaningful opportunity to consult with counsel and certain related parties, such as a relative, within an hour of the start of the secondary inspection and as necessary during the inspection process. The counsel and related party shall be allowed to advocate on behalf of the covered individual, including by providing evidence and information to the examining immigration officer. A lawful permanent resident subject to secondary or deferred inspection may not abandon lawful permanent resident status until the individual has had a meaningful opportunity to seek advice from counsel, unless the individual voluntarily and knowingly waives in writing this opportunity to seek counsel's advice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Counsel Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - On passage (Y: 217 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 209 N: 215 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-04-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-04-21HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 207 (Roll no. 129). (text: CR H2016)
2021-04-21HouseOn motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 215 (Roll no. 128).
2021-04-21HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2030-2032)
2021-04-21HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on the Issa motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Issa demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
2021-04-21HouseThe previous question on the motion was ordered without objection.
2021-04-21HouseMr. Issa moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H2024)
2021-04-21HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2021-04-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1573.
2021-04-21HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 51, H.R. 1573 and H.R. 1333. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The previous question on each measure is considered ordered without intervening motions except one hour of debate and a motion to recommit. H. Res. 316 and H. Con. Res. 30 are adopted.
2021-04-21HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 330. (consideration: CR H2016-2025)
2021-04-20HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 330 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 51, H.R. 1573 and H.R. 1333. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The previous question on each measure is considered ordered without intervening motions except one hour of debate and a motion to recommit. H. Res. 316 and H. Con. Res. 30 are adopted.
2021-04-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 8.
2021-04-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-21.
2021-04-14HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16.
2021-04-14HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback