US HB1567 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prompt and Fast Action to Stop Damages Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prompt and Fast Action to Stop Damages Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB675 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback