US HB1553 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Small Bank Exam Cycle Reform Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to increase from $500 million to $1 billion the asset size of small insured depository institutions eligible for 18-month on-site examination cycles. Such an institution is also qualified for the 18-month cycle if its total assets are at most $200 million (currently $100 million) and the most recent examination found its composite condition to be good rather than outstanding. A federal banking agency is granted discretion to increase this assets ceiling amount from $200 million to $1 billion (currently from $100 million to $500 million) if that greater asset size would be consistent with the principles of safety and soundness.
Title
Small Bank Exam Cycle Reform Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. John Carney [D-DE] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 411 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2015-10-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 534). (text: CR H6802) |
2015-10-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-10-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6818) |
2015-10-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-10-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1553. |
2015-10-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6802-6804) |
2015-10-06 | House | Mr. Neugebauer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-10-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 212. |
2015-10-06 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-280. |
2015-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 58 - 0. |
2015-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB970 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector