US HB1552 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 102-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 829.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 829.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FOCA Act Fair and Open Competition Act This bill prohibits a federal executive agency that awards any construction contract after the enactment of this bill from requiring or prohibiting a contract bidder from entering into agreements with labor organizations (i.e., Project Labor Agreements [PLAs]) or otherwise discriminating against a bidder or contractor who signs, or refuses to sign, a PLA. Agencies that award grants, provide financial assistance, or enter into cooperative agreements for construction projects after the enactment of this bill must ensure that the bid specifications, project agreements, or other controlling documents for such projects do not contain any requirements or prohibitions relating to PLAs. An agency may exempt a particular project or grant from the prohibition of this bill if it determines that special circumstances exist requiring an exemption to avert an imminent threat to public health or safety or to serve the national security.
Title
FOCA Act Fair and Open Competition Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 829. |
2018-12-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1068. |
2017-03-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Related) 2017-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Government operations and politics
Labor-management relations
Public contracts and procurement
Government operations and politics
Labor-management relations
Public contracts and procurement