US HB1550 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for a public awareness campaign with respect to human papillomavirus, and for other purposes.
Title
Promoting Resources to Expand Vaccination, Education, and New Treatments for HPV Cancers Act of 2021 PREVENT HPV Cancers Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6682-6683) |
2021-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1550. |
2021-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6682-6684) |
2021-11-30 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-11-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 132. |
2021-11-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-182. |
2021-07-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2021-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |