US HB1549 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to prohibit the knowing possession of a pill press mold with intent to manufacture in violation of such Act a counterfeit substance in schedule I or II in a capsule, tablet, and other form intended for distribution, and for other purposes.
Title
Criminalizing Abused Substance Templates Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jeff Jackson [D-NC] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4355 (Related) 2024-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB9258 (Related) 2024-08-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB9258 (Related) 2024-08-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1549/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1549/BILLS-118hr1549ih.pdf |