US HB1548 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to specify that actions of the Advocate for Small Business Capital Formation are not a collection of information under the Paperwork Reduction Act.
Title
Improving Access to Small Business Information Act
Sponsors
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 290 (Y: 398 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2023-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-07-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 11 (Roll no. 290). (text: CR H3186) |
2023-07-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3190-3191) |
2023-07-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1548. |
2023-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3185-3187) |
2023-07-11 | House | Mrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106. |
2023-07-11 | House | Committee on Oversight and Accountability discharged. |
2023-07-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-135, Part I. |
2023-04-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 0. |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |